Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Brown, Willie Albert, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Brown, Dora Mae, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ANDREWS, MICHAEL F presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK Comment: CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK; VER: N; K
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
September 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT OR14636PG2252-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14636, Page 2252, 001 pages
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
September 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
September 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE Comment: RECOMMEND OF GENER. MAGISTRATE W/ATTCHD:; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
September 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS) Comment: JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
September 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 092605 11:00; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
August 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE Comment: REPORT OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE W/ATTCHD:; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
August 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER ALLOWING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE 092605 11:00; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
July 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 081205 @ 9 PRO SE; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
June 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING PRO SE; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.