Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Household Finance Corporation Iii, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Thomas Lobello, Iii, against Hart, Henry E, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with FULLERTON, WALTER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFULLERTON, WALTER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2005 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - County |
Last RefreshedJanuary 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
June 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
April 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT SUPPORT SUMMARY JUDGMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
April 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
April 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF LOST ORIGINAL; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
April 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Comment: MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT /AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
April 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 050405 AT 10:45; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
March 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED HENRY E HART 020805; VER: F; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
February 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF Comment: ANSWER OF: HENRY E HART PRO SE; VER: F; D
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
January 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
County Civil Filing - Fee Paid $ Comment: COUNTY CIVIL FILING FEE PAID $255.00; VER: N; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.