Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Household Finance Corp Iii, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Linda Chelvam, against West Coast Fence Inc, Pyramid Aluminum Inc, Pinellas County Clerk Of Court, Lone Star Debt Llc, Harbourage Condominium Association, (total of 9) See All represented by Brian P Deeb, Esq, Michael A Zas, Michael J Brudny, George M Evans, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCAMPBELL, PAMELA AM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2005 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
June 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
COPY OF RECEIPT-RETURNED ORIG NOTE & MTG Comment: COPY OF RECEIPT/RETURNED ORIG NOTE & MTG; VER: F; K
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
June 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE SALE CANCELLED BANKRUPTCY Comment: FORECLOSURE SALE CANCELLED: PER ORDER; VER: N; K
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
June 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
RECORDED AT Comment: RECORDED AT: OR14372PG0862-003; VER: N; P Vol./Book 14372, Page 0862, 003 pages
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
June 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING Comment: ORDER GRANTING MOTION DISSOLVE LIS PENDENS/DISMISS CASE/; VER: N; P
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
June 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
EX-PARTE MOTION Comment: EX-PARTE MOTION: TO DISSOLVE LIS PENDENS/DISMISS CASE ETC; VER: F; P
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
June 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECD BY COURT 060705; VER: F; P
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
June 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED Comment: REOPEN CASE/OTHER; VER: N; P
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
June 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER VACATING Comment: ORDER VACATING FINAL JUDGMENT/CANCEL SALE/RELEASE DOCUMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
June 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.