Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Phoenix Resources Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Gordon, Michelle, Gordon, Jeannine, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with FULLERTON, WALTER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2005 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Comment: COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE: RETND CHECK FOR WRIT; VER: F; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
February 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
February 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
February 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT Comment: JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION BY DEFAULT; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
February 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED - COUNT I; VER: N; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
February 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
February 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
February 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT COUNT I BY CLERK; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
February 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
January 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED MICHELLE GORDON 012505; VER: F; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.