Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Perry, Scott, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Timothy M Ingram, against Powers, Donald Leon, represented by Kim E Wells, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2005 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
September 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
August 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL - SETTLED; VER: F; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
August 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Comment: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF NON-PARTY 081005; VER: F; D
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
August 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUPP INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; D
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
August 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECD BY COURT 080805; VER: F; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
August 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
AMENDED Comment: AMENDED ORDER SETTING MEDIATION 081905 AT 1:30; VER: F; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
August 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
AMENDED Comment: AMENDED JOINT STIPULATION FOR MEDIATION; VER: F; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
July 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Comment: NOTICE CHANGING MEDIATOR/RESCHEDULING MEDIATION; VER: N; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
July 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
END OF VOLUME Comment: END OF VOLUME: 1; VER: N; K
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.