Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dallaire, Elizabeth, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Jawdet I Rubaii, Esq, against Kmart Corporation, represented by Scott M Sarason, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BOYER, BRUCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBOYER, BRUCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2004 |
CategoryNegligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2007 | Docket Event | WITH PREJUDICEComment: WITH PREJUDICE OR16019PG1605-001; VER: F; PVol./Book 16019, Page 1605, 001 pages | |
October 16, 2007 | Docket Event | STIPULATION-ORDERComment: STIPULATION/ORDER DISMISSAL; VER: N; P | |
October 16, 2007 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORMComment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
October 16, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
October 16, 2007 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTERComment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECVD BY COURT 101607; VER: F; P | |
September 19, 2007 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTIONComment: MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT; VER: F; D | |
June 28, 2007 | Docket Event | TEXTComment: NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL - SETTLED; VER: F; P | |
May 17, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTYComment: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF NON-PARTY 051407; VER: F; D | |
May 07, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCEComment: NOTICE OF CONTINUED MEDIATION CONFERENCE 062707 1:30; VER: F; P | |
April 18, 2007 | Docket Event | TEXTComment: NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL - IMPASSE; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.