Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Holden, Kathy Rosalie, Holden, Samuel, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Jeffrey D Peairs, against Drehsen, Christian H, Md, Renaissance Clinique Pa, represented by Stephen H Sears, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BOYER, BRUCE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2004 |
CategoryMalpractice - Medical |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2006 | Docket Event | STIPULATIONComment: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL; VER: F; P | |
June 16, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSALComment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE OR15193PG2145-001; VER: F; PVol./Book 15193, Page 2145, 001 pages | |
June 16, 2006 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
May 24, 2006 | Docket Event | SUBPOENAComment: SUBPOENA FOR TRIAL SERVED; VER: F; P | |
May 19, 2006 | Docket Event | SUBPOENAComment: SUBPOENA FOR TRIAL-SERVED; VER: F; P | |
May 12, 2006 | Docket Event | UNIFORM PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERComment: UNIFORM PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER; VER: F; P | |
May 10, 2006 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONComment: DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (COPY); VER: F; P | |
May 10, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIESComment: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES (COPY); VER: F; P | |
May 10, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIESComment: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS EXPERT INTERROGATORIES (COPY); VER: F; P | |
May 10, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILINGComment: NOTICE OF FILING; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.