Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Liguori, Pat, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Michael J Park, Esq, against Rutherford, David S Individually, Interstate Management Company Llc A Etc Et Al, represented by James D Moriarty, Esq, James Ralph Brown, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BAIRD, W DOUGLAS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2004 |
CategoryNegligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 26, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
November 26, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALComment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
August 01, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICEComment: NOTICE OF MEDIATION 091007 9:00; VER: F; P | |
May 01, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITYComment: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY 062907-070907 091707-092807; VER: F; D | |
February 16, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATIONComment: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION TELEPHONIC/VIDEO DEPO OF MEL LICHTENSTEI; VER: F; D | |
February 16, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATIONComment: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION CROSS-NOTICE DEPO TELEPHONIC/VIDEO; VER: N; D | |
February 16, 2007 | Docket Event | ID NAMEComment: RE: MEL LICHTENSTEIN LCSW; VER: F; D | |
January 24, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONComment: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MEL LICHENSTEIN LCSW (TELEPHONE/; VER: F; D | |
December 22, 2006 | Docket Event | NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENTComment: NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT; VER: F; D | |
December 22, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONComment: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MEL LICHTENSTEIN LCSW (TELEPHONE; VER: F; D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.