Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Zakovic, Jennifer, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Jeffrey K Chambers, against Donald J Amodeo M D P A, Amodeo, Donald M D, represented by Troy J Crotts, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with QUESADA, FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 21, 2004 |
CategoryMalpractice - Medical |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALComment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
April 06, 2005 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORMComment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
April 06, 2005 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING; VER: N; P | |
February 03, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE EXPERT INTERROGATORIESComment: NOTICE OF SERVICE EXPERT INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; D | |
January 28, 2005 | Docket Event | NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENTComment: NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT; VER: F; P | |
December 14, 2004 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONComment: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; D | |
November 29, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIESComment: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; P | |
November 29, 2004 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONComment: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; P | |
November 19, 2004 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONComment: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; D | |
November 19, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIESComment: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.