Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Thermal Sterilization Specialties Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Terry L Hirsch, against Top Line Enterprises Inc, Thermal Technology Services Inc, Newby, Sharon, Masyada, Frank, Krout, James, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SCHAEFFER, SUSAN F presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 13, 2004 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2005 | Docket Event | TEXTComment: **********DO NOT DOCKET THIS CASE**********; VER: N; P | |
January 12, 2005 | Docket Event | TEXTComment: **********CONS INTO 03-6413CI-08***********; VER: N; P | |
January 12, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVINGComment: ORDER: ON STIP TO CONSOLIDATE INTO 03-6413CI-08 ETC; VER: F; P | |
January 12, 2005 | Docket Event | CONSOLIDATED (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CONSOLIDATED; VER: N; P | |
December 17, 2004 | Docket Event | COPYComment: COPY MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION; VER: F; D | |
December 15, 2004 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTIONComment: MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION; VER: F; D | |
December 09, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARINGComment: NOTICE OF HEARING 030805 1:30PM; VER: F; P | |
November 16, 2004 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTIONComment: MOTION TO DISMISS AND ABATE; VER: F; D | |
November 09, 2004 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTIONComment: MOTION TO ABATE AND/OR DISMISS; VER: F; D | |
November 05, 2004 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVEDComment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED THERMAL TECHNOLOGY SERVICES INC 102004; VER: F; K |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.