Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Shelby, Barbara Lynne, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by William H Walker, against Oldsmar Fire Services Llc, represented by Donald A Mihokovich, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McGRADY, J THOMAS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 28, 2004 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2008 | Docket Event | WITH PREJUDICEComment: WITH PREJUDICE OR16171PG2553-002; VER: F; PVol./Book 16171, Page 2553, 002 pages | |
March 04, 2008 | Docket Event | STIPULATIONComment: STIPULATION /ORDER DISMISSING CAUSE; VER: N; P | |
March 04, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
March 04, 2008 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTERComment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECEIVED BY COURT 030308; VER: F; P | |
January 15, 2008 | Docket Event | TEXTComment: NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL - IMPASSE; VER: F; P | |
October 16, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCEComment: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 011008 1:00; VER: F; P | |
October 02, 2007 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTIONComment: MOTION FOR MEDIATION; VER: F; P | |
September 14, 2007 | Docket Event | RESPONSEComment: RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION AND; VER: N; D | |
September 14, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICEComment: NOTICE OF CORRECTION OF ADDRESS OF ATTORNEY FOR DEFT; VER: F; D | |
September 04, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 000000-MLD AS TOComment: OLDSMAR FIRE SERVICES LLC; VER: N; K |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.