Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Iseli Company, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Ralph S Marcadis, Esq, against Unimed Surgical Products Inc, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BAIRD, W DOUGLAS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 28, 2004 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2013 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
June 28, 2010 | Docket Event | CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDINGComment: C/C JUDGEMENT MADE/HANDED RECORDING OR16961PG1111-001; VER: R; KVol./Book 16961, Page 1111, 001 pages | |
February 09, 2010 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT (SRS)Comment: JUDGMENT; VER: N; P | |
February 09, 2010 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENTComment: FINAL JUDGMENT OR16827PG1780-001; VER: F; PVol./Book 16827, Page 1780, 001 pages | |
February 09, 2010 | Docket Event | FACT INFORMATION SHEETComment: FACT INFORMATION SHEET (BLANK); VER: F; P | |
February 03, 2010 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORMComment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
February 03, 2010 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVITComment: AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT IN PAYMENT; VER: F; P | |
November 23, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDERComment: ORDER ON GOOD CAUSE - 120 DAYS; VER: F; P | |
November 09, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICEComment: NOTICE OF GOOD CAUSE; VER: F; P | |
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIESComment: NOTICE-LACK OF PROS MLD TO PLTF/PLTF ATTY; VER: N; K |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.