Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rental Service Corporation Usa Inc, filed a(n) Bad Check - Circuit case represented by Daniel L Moody, against Logistical Precast Services Inc, represented by Guy Victor Murray, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CASE, JAMES R presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 28, 2004 |
CategoryBad Check - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALComment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; VER: F; P | |
February 22, 2006 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORMComment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
February 22, 2006 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING; VER: N; P | |
February 06, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S)Comment: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S) (S)/PLTF(S) ATTY(S); VER: N; K | |
February 06, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY 000000Comment: NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY: 030806 MAILED AS TO:; VER: N; K | |
February 06, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY 000000Comment: LOGISTICAL PRECAST SERVICES INC; VER: N; K | |
December 23, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSELComment: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL AND CONTACT NUMBERS; VER: F; P | |
August 19, 2004 | Docket Event | ANSWER OFComment: ANSWER OF: LOGISTICAL PRECAST SERVICES INC; VER: F; D | |
August 10, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILINGComment: NOTICE OF FILING; VER: F; P | |
August 10, 2004 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVITComment: AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.