Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cain And Bultman Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Ronald W Gregory, Ii, against Levy, Randy, represented by Stephen J Finta, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SCHAEFFER, SUSAN F presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 27, 2004 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONComment: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF RANDY LEVY; VER: F; P | |
January 24, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OFComment: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF: FACT INFORMATION SHEETS; VER: F; P | |
November 03, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICEComment: NOTICE SERVING FACT INFORMATION SHEETS; VER: F; P | |
October 22, 2004 | Docket Event | CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDINGComment: C/C JUDGEMENT MADE/HANDED RECORDING; VER: N; K | |
October 22, 2004 | Docket Event | Recording Of Judgment Lien - Fee Paid $Comment: RECORDING OF JDMT LIEN - FEE PAID $18.50; VER: N; P | |
October 19, 2004 | Docket Event | PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIENComment: PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN; VER: F; P | |
October 11, 2004 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENTComment: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT ON DEFAULT; VER: F; P | |
October 11, 2004 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENTComment: FINAL JUDGMENT ON DEFAULT OR13881PG1413-002; VER: F; PVol./Book 13881, Page 1413, 002 pages | |
October 11, 2004 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO)Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P | |
October 11, 2004 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEESComment: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.