Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Xerox Corporation, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Thomas K Sciarrino, Jr, against Trainix Inc, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with LENDERMAN, JOHN C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 26, 2004 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2005 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTEREDComment: DEFAULT ENTERED; VER: N; K | |
August 02, 2005 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVITComment: AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM/; VER: N; P | |
August 02, 2005 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICEComment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; VER: F; P | |
August 02, 2005 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTSComment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO INTEREST/COSTS; VER: F; P | |
June 15, 2005 | Docket Event | PLURIES SUMMONS RETD SERVEDComment: PLURIES SUMMONS RETD SERVED TRAINIX INC 053105; VER: F; K | |
May 09, 2005 | Docket Event | SUMMONS MAILED TO ATTORNEYComment: PLURIES SUMMONS MAILED TO ATTY - TRAINIX INC; VER: N; K | |
May 06, 2005 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PLURIES SUMMONSComment: REQUEST FOR PLURIES SUMMONS; VER: F; P | |
May 06, 2005 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVITComment: AFFIDAVIT OF LOST ALIAS SUMMONS; VER: F; P | |
December 17, 2004 | Docket Event | SUMMONS MAILED TO ATTORNEYComment: ALIAS SUMMONS ON AMENDED MAILED TO ATTY - TRAINIX INC; VER: N; K | |
December 06, 2004 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONSComment: REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.