Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Vose, Tracy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Paul R Cavonis, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with LOGAN, WALTER D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLOGAN, WALTER D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 21, 2004 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2005 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTERComment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECEIVED BY COURT 053105; VER: F; P | |
June 01, 2005 | Docket Event | STIPULATIONComment: STIPULATION TO DISMISS W/PREJUDICE/ORDER OR14361PG2628-002; VER: F; PVol./Book 14361, Page 2628, 002 pages | |
June 01, 2005 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
May 25, 2005 | Docket Event | TEXTComment: NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL --- SETTLED; VER: F; P | |
May 25, 2005 | Docket Event | STIPULATIONComment: STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT; VER: F; P | |
May 03, 2005 | Docket Event | RESPONSEComment: FOURTH SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES; VER: F; D | |
April 25, 2005 | Docket Event | RESPONSEComment: THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES; VER: F; D | |
April 25, 2005 | Docket Event | RESPONSEComment: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES(2); VER: F; D | |
April 18, 2005 | Docket Event | RESPONSEComment: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES; VER: F; D | |
April 14, 2005 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTALComment: SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES (SECOND); VER: F; D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.