Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Summers, Genevieve, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Paul P Latvis, against Preferred Rent-A-Car Inc, Pais, Anna Ines, represented by Edward F Gagain, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CASE, JAMES R presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 19, 2004 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2006 | Docket Event | STIPULATIONComment: STIPULATION /MOTION FOR DISMISSAL; VER: F; P | |
March 08, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSALComment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE OR14977PG0315-001; VER: F; PVol./Book 14977, Page 0315, 001 pages | |
March 08, 2006 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORMComment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
March 08, 2006 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
March 08, 2006 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTERComment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; VER: F; D | |
June 09, 2005 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONComment: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; P | |
May 24, 2005 | Docket Event | REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSESComment: REPLY TO ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; VER: F; P | |
March 21, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARINGComment: NOTICE OF HEARING 040505 9:00; VER: F; D | |
March 18, 2005 | Docket Event | ID NAMEComment: PREFERRED RENT-A-CAR INC; VER: N; D | |
March 18, 2005 | Docket Event | ID NAMEComment: ANNA INES PAIS; VER: N; D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.