Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Spearman, Mary Ann, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Graham Daniel Kligerman, against Freedom Processing Services Inc, Donovan, William, Butler, Richard Trustee, represented by Daniel J Kortenhaus, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SHAMES, MARK I presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 14, 2004 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
COPY Comment: COPY NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
June 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
June 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
May 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 060506 11:00; VER: F; D
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
May 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION Comment: MOTION FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL; VER: F; D
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
December 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
COPY CORRESPONDENCE RE Comment: COPY CORRESPONDENCE RE: HIRED COUNSEL/ALLOW TIME PRO SE; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
December 03, 2004 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
June 14, 2004 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF-AS DESIGNATED Comment: WILLIAM DONOVAN AND; VER: N; D
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
June 14, 2004 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF-AS DESIGNATED Comment: FREEDOM PROCESSING SERVICES INC AND; VER: N; D
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
June 14, 2004 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT; VER: F; D
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.