Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Innovative Remediation Services Llp, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Jeremy M Walker, against Remediation Technologies Of Florida Llc, Remediation Technologies Llc, Environmental Technologies Llc, represented by William J Cook, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RONDOLINO, ANTHONY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 14, 2004 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2004 | Docket Event | TEXTComment: ***** DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE *****************************; VER: N; P | |
August 24, 2004 | Docket Event | TEXTComment: ***** CONSOLIDATED W/04-2363-CI-15 ***************************; VER: N; P | |
August 24, 2004 | Docket Event | ORDERComment: ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE W/04-2363-CI-15; VER: F; P | |
August 24, 2004 | Docket Event | CONSOLIDATED (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CONSOLIDATED; VER: F; P | |
July 19, 2004 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONComment: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; P | |
July 13, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARINGComment: NOTICE OF HEARING 080404 AT 2:00; VER: F; P | |
June 07, 2004 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISSComment: MTN DISM LACK JURISDICTION SUBJ MATTER; VER: F; D | |
June 03, 2004 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONComment: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; D | |
June 01, 2004 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINTComment: AMENDED COMPLAINT; VER: F; P | |
May 14, 2004 | Docket Event | THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTIONComment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 013 BY 1351 - RANDOM CI; VER: N; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.