Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcnealy, Paul, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Richard Mulholland, against Gianfrancesco, James, Fcs Inc, represented by Mark D Freeman, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with QUESADA, FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeQUESADA, FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 13, 2004 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALComment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
June 08, 2005 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORMComment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
April 14, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSALComment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE (FINAL) OR14253PG0351-001; VER: F; PVol./Book 14253, Page 0351, 001 pages | |
April 14, 2005 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATIONComment: JOINT STIPULATION FOR FINAL DISMISSAL; VER: F; P | |
April 14, 2005 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORMComment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
April 14, 2005 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
April 14, 2005 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTERComment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; VER: F; P | |
April 06, 2005 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIESComment: REQUEST FOR COPIES -FAXED 4/7/05; VER: N; K | |
March 23, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATIONComment: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION; VER: F; P | |
October 06, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONComment: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF JAMES FIANFRANCESCO; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.