Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Best, Catherine, Bowling, Randolph Scott, filed a(n) Declaratory - Circuit case represented by Jill H Bowman, John A Yanchunis, against Special Data Processing Corporation, represented by James Michael Walls, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with QUESADA, FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeQUESADA, FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 06, 2004 |
CategoryDeclaratory - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2006 | Docket Event | FILE RETD TO CIV COURT RECORDS FROM APPEALSComment: FILE RETD TO CIV COURT RECORDS FROM APPEALS; VER: N; K | |
May 12, 2006 | Docket Event | APPEAL CLERK'S WORKSHEET WITH ATTACHMENTComment: APPEAL CLERK'S WORKSHEET W/ATTACHMENT; VER: F; K | |
May 11, 2006 | Docket Event | APPEAL DISMISSEDComment: APPEAL DISMISSED STIP FOR DISMISSAL GRANTED; VER: F; P | |
April 28, 2006 | Docket Event | TEXTComment: 050906 AND IF INTENT TO PURSUE APPEAL; VER: F; P | |
April 28, 2006 | Docket Event | DCA ORDERComment: DCA ORDER: APPELLANT TO ADVISE STATUS OF SETTLEMENT BY; VER: N; P | |
March 31, 2006 | Docket Event | DCA ORDERComment: DCA ORDER: JOINT MOTION FOR STAY IS GRANTED UNTIL 041706; VER: F; P | |
January 27, 2006 | Docket Event | DCA ORDERComment: DCA ORDER: JOINT MOTION FOR STAY IS GRANTED UNTIL 032706; VER: F; P | |
October 31, 2005 | Docket Event | DCA ORDERComment: DCA ORDER: JOINT MOTION FOR STAY IS GRANTED UNTIL 012806; VER: F; P | |
September 12, 2005 | Docket Event | DCA ORDER ANSWER BRIEF DUEComment: DCA ORDER: REPLY BRIEF DUE 092205; VER: F; P | |
August 31, 2005 | Docket Event | DCA ORDER ANSWER BRIEF DUEComment: DCA ORDER: REPLY BRIEF DUE 090805; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.