Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rental Service Corporation Usa Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Daniel L Moody, against G Team Of Florida Inc, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KHOUZAM, NELLY N presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKHOUZAM, NELLY N Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 03, 2004 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2005 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOComment: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO OF JESUS DOMINGUEZ; VER: F; P | |
February 16, 2005 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPOSITIONComment: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPO SERVED; VER: F; K | |
January 25, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONComment: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; VER: F; P | |
January 07, 2005 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENTComment: FINAL JUDGMENT; VER: F; P | |
January 07, 2005 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO)Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P | |
January 06, 2005 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTERComment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER FILED W/CLERK 010705; VER: F; P | |
August 25, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILINGComment: NOTICE OF FILING; VER: F; P | |
August 25, 2004 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVITComment: AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM; VER: F; P | |
June 29, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILINGComment: NOTICE OF FILING; VER: F; P | |
June 29, 2004 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEESComment: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.