Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Howard, Richard A, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Cameron W Brumblelow, against Family Dollar Stores Of Florida Inc, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BOYER, BRUCE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2004 |
CategoryNegligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALComment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
May 09, 2005 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORMComment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
May 09, 2005 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
April 21, 2005 | Docket Event | TEXTComment: NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL --SETLED; VER: F; P | |
April 13, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCEComment: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; VER: F; D | |
April 12, 2005 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIESComment: REQUEST FOR COPIES; VER: F; P | |
April 04, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTYComment: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF NON-PARTY 040105; VER: F; D | |
April 04, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCEComment: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; VER: F; P | |
March 31, 2005 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE MEDIATION CONFERENCEComment: THIRD AMENDED NOTICE MEDIATION CONFERENCE 041805 10:00; VER: F; P | |
March 30, 2005 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIESComment: REQUEST FOR COPIES; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.