Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Eatherton, Thomas, Eatherton, Cynthia, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by J Scott Murphy, against Shay, Mark, Md, Polles, Mark Arnp, Oldenski, Richard, Md, Florida Institute Of Family Medicine Pa, represented by David C Banker, Aram P Megerian, Esq, Troy J Crotts, Jeffrey S Obrien, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with QUESADA, FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeQUESADA, FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2004 |
CategoryMalpractice - Medical |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2005 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATIONComment: JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL; VER: F; P | |
August 16, 2005 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
August 16, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALComment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
August 16, 2005 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORMComment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
July 19, 2005 | Docket Event | ID NAMEComment: FLORIDA INSTITUTE OF FAMILY MEDICINE PA; VER: F; P | |
July 19, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALComment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE (LIMITED) AS TO; VER: N; P | |
July 19, 2005 | Docket Event | ID NAMEComment: RICHARD OLDENSKI MD; VER: N; P | |
July 12, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPINGComment: NOTICE OF DROPPING GREGORY MITCHELL MD W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
July 08, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE TRIAL-ORDER PRETRIAL CONFERENCEComment: NOTICE TRIAL/ORDER PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 090705 10:15; VER: N; P | |
July 08, 2005 | Docket Event | TRIAL WEEK OFComment: TRIAL WEEK OF: 101005 9:00; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.