Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Danka Office Imaging Company, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Thomas L Avrutis, against Harper Bros Inc, represented by John H Dannecker, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with LENDERMAN, JOHN C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2004 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2004 | Docket Event | STIPULATIONComment: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
February 24, 2004 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSALComment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
February 24, 2004 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORMComment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
February 24, 2004 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
January 30, 2004 | Docket Event | TEXTComment: AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; VER: F; D | |
January 30, 2004 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENTComment: MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT; VER: F; D | |
January 30, 2004 | Docket Event | ANSWER OFComment: ANSWER OF: HARPER BROS INC; VER: N; D | |
January 29, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCEComment: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; VER: F; D | |
January 26, 2004 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVEDComment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED HARPER BROS INC 011204; VER: F; K | |
January 05, 2004 | Docket Event | THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTIONComment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 019 BY 1351 - RANDOM CI; VER: N; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.