Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rental Service Corporation Usa Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Daniel L Moody, against Royal American Construction Company Inc, represented by Clifford W Sanborn, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BAIRD, W DOUGLAS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBAIRD, W DOUGLAS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2003 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2007 | Docket Event | WITH PREJUDICEComment: WITH PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
October 26, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALComment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; VER: N; P | |
October 26, 2007 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORMComment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
October 26, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
October 01, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 000000-MLD AS TOComment: ROYAL AMERICAN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC; VER: N; K | |
October 01, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 000000-MLD AS TOComment: NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED AS TO:; VER: N; K | |
September 29, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDERComment: ORDER ON MOTN DISMISS/TRANSFER VENUE DENIED; VER: F; P | |
September 29, 2006 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTERComment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECEIVED BY COURT 092806; VER: F; P | |
July 19, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARINGComment: NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING 090506 2:15; VER: F; P | |
November 09, 2005 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONComment: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.