Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
First Floridian Auto And Home Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Jacob J Linhart, against Hansen, Ralph, Giddens, Timothy E, Geiger, Richard, represented by David L Bresler, Stephen G Conlin, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with LENDERMAN, JOHN C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLENDERMAN, JOHN C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2003 |
CategoryNegligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATIONComment: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 090104 9:45; VER: F; D | |
August 19, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALComment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
August 19, 2004 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
August 10, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARINGComment: NOTICE OF HEARING 090104 9:45; VER: F; D | |
August 06, 2004 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTINGComment: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS ETC OR13757PG0062-001; VER: F; DVol./Book 13757, Page 0062, 001 pages | |
August 02, 2004 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISSComment: MOTION DISMISS /THREE COUNT COMPLAINT; VER: F; D | |
July 06, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARINGComment: NOTICE OF HEARING 080204 9:15; VER: F; P | |
July 06, 2004 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISSComment: MOTION DISMISS FOR SUBSTANTIVE AND OPERATIVE PROVISIONS; VER: F; D | |
July 01, 2004 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTIONComment: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT; VER: F; P | |
June 28, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATIONComment: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 062804 2:15; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.