Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Transamerica Commercial Finance Corporation, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Troy R Lotane, Esq, against Lane, James, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with LENDERMAN, JOHN C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLENDERMAN, JOHN C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2003 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2004 | Docket Event | Recording Of Judgment Lien - Fee Paid $Comment: RECORDING OF JDMT LIEN - FEE PAID $6.00; VER: N; P | |
March 09, 2004 | Docket Event | CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDINGComment: C/C JUDGEMENT MADE/HANDED RECORDING; VER: N; K | |
March 05, 2004 | Docket Event | PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIENComment: PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN; VER: F; P | |
February 25, 2004 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENTComment: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; VER: F; P | |
February 25, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE NON-COMPLIANCE OF ADM. ORDER 86-44Comment: NOTICE NON-COMPLIANCE OF ADM. ORDER 86-44; VER: F; P | |
February 25, 2004 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENTComment: FINAL JUDGMENT OR13395PG1448-001; VER: F; PVol./Book 13395, Page 1448, 001 pages | |
February 25, 2004 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO)Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P | |
February 25, 2004 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEETComment: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VER: F; P | |
February 23, 2004 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTERComment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER FILED W/CLERK 022504; VER: F; P | |
February 12, 2004 | Docket Event | TEXTComment: JUDITH F LANE; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.