Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Slaughter, Kaye D, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Paul R Cavonis, Esq, against Thach, Dan, Nationwide General Insurance Company, represented by Rolando G Guerra, Jr, Lynley B Flagler, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with LOGAN, WALTER D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLOGAN, WALTER D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2003 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2005 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORMComment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
March 29, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSALComment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE OR14211PG1037-001; VER: F; PVol./Book 14211, Page 1037, 001 pages | |
March 29, 2005 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATIONComment: JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL; VER: F; P | |
March 28, 2005 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTERComment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER FILED W/CLERK 032905; VER: F; P | |
March 21, 2005 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATIONComment: JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
March 21, 2005 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORMComment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
March 21, 2005 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
March 01, 2005 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOComment: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM W/O DEPO SERVED (2); VER: F; D | |
February 17, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICEComment: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF TAKING DEPO DUCES TECUM; VER: F; D | |
February 10, 2005 | Docket Event | NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENTComment: NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT; VER: F; D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.