Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Leifheit, Josephine, Leifheit, Francis, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by James L Magazine, against United Parcel Service, represented by Glenn G Gomer, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RONDOLINO, ANTHONY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRONDOLINO, ANTHONY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2003 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2005 | Docket Event | TEXTComment: AS TO EMMAGENE HARRIS; VER: F; P | |
January 03, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDERComment: ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: N; P | |
January 03, 2005 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATIONComment: JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL; VER: F; P | |
January 03, 2005 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTERComment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; VER: F; D | |
December 22, 2004 | Docket Event | STIPULATIONComment: STIPULATION /ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
December 22, 2004 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORMComment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
July 30, 2004 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOComment: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM W/O DEPO SERVED; VER: F; D | |
July 06, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALComment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
July 06, 2004 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
July 02, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATIONComment: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPO; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.