Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcallister, Thomas G, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Bryan A Kutchins, against Hewitt Associates Llc, represented by Horace N Moore, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ALLAN, LINDA R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeALLAN, LINDA R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2003 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALComment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
May 21, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
May 12, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 000000-MLD AS TOComment: NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED AS TO:; VER: N; K | |
May 12, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 000000-MLD AS TOComment: HEWITT ASSOCIATES LLC; VER: N; K | |
April 30, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARINGComment: NOTICE OF HEARING 051107 9:30; VER: F; P | |
April 30, 2007 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONSComment: MOTION ADDITIONAL SANCTIONS; VER: F; P | |
April 27, 2007 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONComment: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; D | |
March 13, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDERComment: ORDER MOTN FOR SANCTIONS/MOTN TO STRIKE; VER: F; P | |
March 13, 2007 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTERComment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; VER: F; P | |
January 22, 2007 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONSComment: MOTION SANCTIONS AND; VER: N; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.