Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Payless Car Rental System Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Linster E Brinkley, against Riverside Cars And Trucks Inc, Kritko, John R, Grimm, William N, Grimm, Jan, represented by A Wade James, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with LENDERMAN, JOHN C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLENDERMAN, JOHN C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2003 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2004 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTINGComment: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS; VER: F; D | |
March 16, 2004 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORMComment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
March 16, 2004 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
March 03, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILINGComment: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT; VER: F; D | |
March 03, 2004 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVITComment: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS; VER: F; D | |
March 02, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILINGComment: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT; VER: F; P | |
March 02, 2004 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVITComment: AFFIDAVIT OF KATHY JOHNSON; VER: F; P | |
February 05, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARINGComment: NOTICE OF HEARING 030304 @9:30; VER: F; D | |
January 26, 2004 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISSComment: MOTION DISMISS COMPLAINT/ATTEMPT TO FRAME CAUSE OF ACTION; VER: F; D | |
January 07, 2004 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESSComment: RIVERSIDE CARS AND TRUCKS INC 122903; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.