Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Spiropoulos, Christine, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Lloyd T Davidson, against Wedgewood Of Palm Harbor Homeowners Association, represented by Joseph Patner, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CASE, JAMES R presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2003 |
CategoryNegligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSALComment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE OR15202PG2472-001; VER: F; PVol./Book 15202, Page 2472, 001 pages | |
June 21, 2006 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATIONComment: JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
June 21, 2006 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
June 21, 2006 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTERComment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; VER: F; P | |
June 08, 2006 | Docket Event | TEXTComment: NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL - SETTLED; VER: F; P | |
March 31, 2006 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOComment: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM W/O DEPO SERVED; VER: F; D | |
February 27, 2006 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIESComment: REQUEST FOR COPIES; VER: F; P | |
February 23, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTYComment: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF NON-PARTY 022206; VER: F; D | |
February 21, 2006 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONComment: RESPONSE TO SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; D | |
January 31, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIMEComment: ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME OF TIME FOR MEDIATION; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.