Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Walker, Brandon, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Benjamin Deberg, against Allstate Insurance Company, represented by Joseph Patner, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RONDOLINO, ANTHONY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2003 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2005 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATIONComment: JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL; VER: F; P | |
January 05, 2005 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORMComment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
January 05, 2005 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
January 05, 2005 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTERComment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; VER: F; P | |
January 05, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSALComment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
December 27, 2004 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORMComment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
November 24, 2004 | Docket Event | WITNESS LISTComment: WITNESS LIST AND EXHIBIT LIST FOR USE AT TRIAL; VER: F; P | |
November 19, 2004 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT TO EXAMComment: REQUEST FOR PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT TO EXAM 122204 AT 9:00 (SECOND); VER: F; D | |
November 17, 2004 | Docket Event | WITNESS LISTComment: WITNESS LIST AND EXHIBIT LISTS AND EXPERT WITNESS COMPLIANCE; VER: F; D | |
September 17, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICEComment: NOTICE OF SERVING OFFER OF JUDGMENT; VER: F; D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.