Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Gary W Lyons, Esq filed a(n) Estate case in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with ST. ARNOLD, JACK R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeST. ARNOLD, JACK R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2002 |
CategoryEstate |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2003 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION AMENDED ORDER FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION OR12665PG1703-003 | |
April 01, 2003 | Docket Event | (((((( FILE VERIFIED TO THIS DATE )))))) (((((( FILE VERIFIED TO THIS DATE )))))) CSH | |
March 24, 2003 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE REQUESTING COPY CORRESPONDENCE/REQUEST FOR COPY | |
March 24, 2003 | Docket Event | AMENDED PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION AMENDED PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION | |
October 11, 2002 | Docket Event | CLAIM - SUNSTAR CLAIM - SUNSTAR | |
August 22, 2002 | Docket Event | ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE | |
August 22, 2002 | Docket Event | ORDER TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD ORDER TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD OR12182PG2409-002 | |
August 22, 2002 | Docket Event | DISPOSED BEFORE A HEARING DISPOSED BEFORE A HEARING | |
August 22, 2002 | Docket Event | CLERKS SUMMARY WORKSLIP - INTAKE CLERK'S SUMMARY WORKSLIP | |
August 22, 2002 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION OR12182PG2406-003 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.