Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Fiorillo, Richard P filed a(n) Estate case in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with ST. ARNOLD, JACK R presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 25, 2002 |
CategoryEstate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2004 | Docket Event | DISPOSED BY JUDGE DISPOSED BY JUDGE | |
February 20, 2004 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE ORDER OF DISCHARGE OR13392PG2567-001 | |
February 19, 2004 | Docket Event | CLERKS AUDIT COMPLETED CLERK'S AUDIT COMPLETED RM/ODIS | |
February 19, 2004 | Docket Event | CLERKS SUMMARY WORKSLIP - INTAKE CLERK'S SUMMARY WORKSLIP | |
February 06, 2004 | Docket Event | VOUCHERS VOUCHERS (COPY) | |
February 06, 2004 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE CORRESPONDENCE (COPY) | |
February 06, 2004 | Docket Event | ESTATE CORRESPONDENCE RECEIVED ESTATE CORRESPONDENCE RECEIVED | |
January 16, 2004 | Docket Event | ORDER - CHECKLIST ORDER-CHECKLIST | |
January 15, 2004 | Docket Event | CLERKS AUDIT COMPLETED CLERK'S AUDIT COMPLETED RM | |
January 15, 2004 | Docket Event | (((((( FILE VERIFIED TO THIS DATE )))))) (((((( FILE VERIFIED TO THIS DATE )))))) RM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.