Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Dwyer, Thomas L, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Hardy, Charles, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCARASSAS, JOHN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 07, 2002 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
April 04, 2002 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED; VER: F; K
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
April 01, 2002 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION TO SHERIFF; VER: N; K
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 29, 2002 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Comment: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; VER: F; K
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 28, 2002 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF Comment: ANSWER OF: CHARLES HARDY PRO SE; VER: F; D
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 28, 2002 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: REGISTRY OF COURT; VER: F; D
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 28, 2002 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION Comment: MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO; VER: N; D
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 28, 2002 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED Comment: REOPEN CASE/OTHER; VER: N; D
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 22, 2002 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION OR11904PG0814-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 11904, Page 0814, 001 pages
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 22, 2002 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.