Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ames, Carol, Ames, George J, Baker, Jason A, Baker, Sarah A, Leppla, Donald, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Orsatti, Chad Thomas, against Bridwell, Joseph F, Bridwell, Melanie, Nolte, Carrie L, Nolte, Joseph S, represented by Pope, Carter Jameson, in the jurisdiction of Pasco County, FL, . Pasco County, FL Superior Courts with LEWIS, KEMBA DAMALI JOHNSON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 03, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPasco County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Jason A. Baker and Sarah A. Baker, Donald Leppla and Marjorie Leppla, and George J. Ames and Carol Ames against Joseph F. Bridwell and Melanie Bridwell. The plaintiffs are seeking declaratory and injunctive relief. The plai...
Subpoena For Hearing AMENDED, ISSUED
Date: June 01, 2023Notice of Filing CASELAW, FILED BY PLFS
Date: May 19, 2023Request E-FILING PRIORITY
Date: May 19, 2023Subpoena For Trial
Date: June 08, 2023Return of Service on Subpoena Served FILED BY PLTFS
Date: June 09, 2023Notice Of Taking Deposition
Date: May 24, 2023Affidavit DF
Date: May 22, 2023Notice of Limited Appearance NON-PARTY
Date: May 22, 2023Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments
Date: May 25, 2023Subpoena For Hearing ISSUED
Date: June 01, 2023Order Denying PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL
Date: May 25, 2023Notice of Filing DEPOSITION PL
Date: June 14, 2023Attachment or Exhibit to Pleading DEPOSITION
Date: June 14, 2023Notice of Filing PL
Date: June 15, 2023Notice of Filing PL
Date: June 14, 2023Proof of Service TAMMY PHILLIPS 060823
Date: June 15, 2023Notice of Cancellation of Hearing
Date: June 19, 2023Order on Emergency Motion (Does Not Qualify as an Emergency)
Date: June 29, 2023Notice of Cancellation of Hearing SET ON 081023
Date: July 11, 2023Motion for Leave
Date: July 18, 2023Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments
Date: July 20, 2023Order ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND
Date: July 20, 2023Summons to be Issued by Clerk
Date: July 21, 2023Summons Issued by Clerk
Date: July 24, 2023Affidavit Of Non Military Service
Date: August 02, 2023Affidavit Of Diligent Search
Date: August 02, 2023Summons to be Issued by Clerk
Date: August 02, 2023Affidavit of Service Served
Date: August 02, 2023Notice of Discharge/Cancellation of Lis Pendens
Date: August 25, 2023Answer TO COMPLAINT
Date: September 01, 2023Motion for Clerk's Default
Date: September 08, 2023Notice of Action to be Issued
Date: September 11, 2023Motion for Clerk's Default
Date: September 12, 2023Default Denied
Date: September 13, 2023Default Denied
Date: September 12, 2023Default Entered
Date: September 12, 2023Default Entered
Date: September 13, 2023Amended Notice Of Hearing 081023 AT 2:00PM
Date: June 27, 2023Motion EMERGENCY MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT
Date: June 28, 2023Default Entered
Date: September 14, 2023Default Denied
Date: September 14, 2023Summons to be Issued by Clerk
Date: October 17, 2023Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments
Date: September 26, 2023Correspondence To Press For Publication
Date: October 05, 2023Summons Issued by Clerk
Date: October 18, 2023Notice Of Action By Publication
Date: October 05, 2023Answer And Affirmative Defense
Date: October 13, 2023Proof of Publication
Date: November 03, 2023Answer TO NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: November 13, 2023Request For Admissions
Date: December 12, 2023Request To Produce
Date: December 12, 2023Notice Of Serving Interrogatories
Date: December 12, 2023Motion
Date: August 03, 2023Affidavit of Service Served
Date: August 03, 2023Summons Issued by Clerk
Date: August 04, 2023Affidavit of Service Served
Date: August 09, 2023Summons Issued by Clerk
Date: August 08, 2023Affidavit of Service Served
Date: August 10, 2023Affidavit Service Of SUMMONS RETD SVD
Date: August 15, 2023Order Approving JOINT STIPULATION FOR Settlement
Date: August 21, 2023Answer
Date: August 24, 2023Notice Of Appearance
Date: August 24, 2023Return of Service on Subpoena Served FILED BY PLTFS
Date: May 11, 2023Notice of Filing DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT FILED BY DEFS
Date: May 09, 2023Subpoena ISSUED
Date: May 10, 2023Return of Service on Subpoena Served
Date: May 10, 2023Notice of Filing FILED BY PLFS
Date: May 10, 2023Notice of Hearing 051723 AT 1045AM
Date: May 12, 2023Notice of Filing PL
Date: May 15, 2023Notice of Cancellation of Hearing SETON 052223
Date: May 15, 2023Order Setting TELEPHONIC Case Management Conference
Date: May 12, 2023Attachment or Exhibit to Pleading PL
Date: May 15, 2023Amended Notice Of Hearing 052223 AT 1:00
Date: May 15, 2023Amended Notice Of Hearing 052223 AT 1:00PM
Date: May 16, 2023Amended Notice Of Hearing 062023 AT 1:00
Date: May 17, 2023Attachment or Exhibit to Pleading
Date: March 03, 2022Affidavit Of Non Military Service DEF
Date: March 03, 2022Civil Cover Sheet
Date: March 03, 2022Complaint
Date: March 03, 2022Summons to be Issued by Clerk
Date: March 03, 2022Notice Of Lis Pendens
Date: March 03, 2022Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY, JOSEPH F BRIDWELL
Date: March 03, 2022Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY, MELANIE BRIDWELL
Date: March 03, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Request For Admissions | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Request To Produce | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Of Serving Interrogatories | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer TO NOTICE OF ACTION | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication | |
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Issued by Clerk | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons to be Issued by Clerk | |
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer And Affirmative Defense | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence To Press For Publication | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Of Action By Publication |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.