Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ramirez, Marie M, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ramirez, Arayn, in the jurisdiction of Pasco County, FL, . Pasco County, FL Superior Courts with DISKEY, DANIEL DWIGHT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDISKEY, DANIEL DWIGHT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPasco County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Judgment of Dissolution of Marriage | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Corroborating Witness OBO PETITIONER | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Correspondence FILING COPY OF WARRANTY DEED | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Denying MOTION AS UNTIMELY | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion FOR CASE TO BE HEARD BY JUDGE FILED BY RESP | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Denying MOTION FOR CASE TO BE HEARD BY JUDGRE AS UNTIMELY | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Order To File Required Documents | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing BEFORE GENERAL MAGISTRATE 03082021 1:00PM VIA PHONE CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.