Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chase Usa, Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Muren, Tara, against Thomas J Appelhans, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2010 |
CategoryCollections - Consumer Credit (Crc 3.740) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time518 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO DISPOSITION THE CASE BY PLAINTIFF VACATED |
|
May 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
CIVIL SAD BEFORE TRIAL - REQ. DISM. - NO ADR Not Applicable |
|
May 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
May 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE Not Applicable |
|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event | HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 6/11/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 33 | |
March 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR FILING OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN 360 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT OSC ISSUED |
|
September 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE FILED WITHIN 180 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT VACATED |
|
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CMPL (CRC 3.740) FILED 12/09/2010 OF CHASE USA, NA AS TO THOMAS J APPELHANS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/19/11 Not Applicable |
|
March 12, 2011 | Docket Event | PLACED ON CLERK'S TICKLER CALENDAR FOR 9/09/11, AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33 | |
March 12, 2011 | Docket Event | PLACED ON CLERK'S TICKLER CALENDAR FOR 3/07/12, AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.