Case Last Refreshed: 3 days ago
Crystal Derrick, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Seth Green, against Susan Ann Vairo, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with Maxine D. Cheesman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2024 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedJune 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint involves a civil action filed by Plaintiff Crystal Derrick against Defendant Susan Ann Vairo in the Circuit Court of the 15th Judicial Circuit in and for Palm Beach County, Florida. The complaint states that on September 8, 2023, Derri...
DCM DESIGNATION TO THE GENERAL TRACK WITH JURY TRIAL ORDER
Date: June 19, 2024REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: June 17, 2024PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 5370947
Date: June 18, 2024NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION
Date: June 17, 2024NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: June 17, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: June 17, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: June 17, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 17, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
DCM DESIGNATION TO THE GENERAL TRACK WITH JURY TRIAL ORDER MAXINE CHEESMAN 06/19/2024 |
|
June 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 5370947 $411.00 5370947 Fully Paid |
|
June 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
DIVISION ASSIGNMENT AJ: Circuit Civil Central - AJ (Civil) |
|
June 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE FIRST TO DFT F/B PLT |
|
June 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION F/B ATTY GREEN OBO PLT |
|
June 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS FIRST SET TO DFT F/B PLT |
|
June 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED PLEADINGS@GREENINJURYFIRM.COM AS TO SUSAN ANN VAIRO E FILED |
|
June 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT F/B PLT |
|
June 17, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.