Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Oliver Maxis, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Andrew Agnini, against Richard Calas, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with James W. Sherman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames W. Sherman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 04, 2024 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is a legal action filed by Plaintiff Olivier Maxis against Defendant Richard Calas in the Circuit Court of the 15th Judicial Circuit in Palm Beach County, Florida. The complaint alleges that on August 12, 2023, Richard Calas, while dri...
DCM DESIGNATION TO THE GENERAL TRACK WITH JURY TRIAL ORDER
Date: April 09, 2024PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 5280065
Date: April 08, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: April 04, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 04, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
DCM DESIGNATION TO THE GENERAL TRACK WITH JURY TRIAL ORDER JAMES SHERMAN 04/09/2024 |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 5280065 $401.00 5280065 Fully Paid |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
DIVISION ASSIGNMENT AK: Circuit Civil Central - AK (Civil) |
|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT F/B PLT |
|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.