Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Samuel Farot filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Kassandra Ulyssa Noce, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with John J. Parnofiello presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn J. Parnofiello Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 09, 2022 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
ORDER FINDING PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: May 09, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: May 09, 2022NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT
Date: May 10, 2022CROSS REFERENCE LIST
Date: May 10, 2022COURT EVENT FORM
Date: May 09, 2022CRIM PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT | |
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | CROSS REFERENCE LIST | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER FINDING PROBABLE CAUSE | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING YES |
|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT FORM | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | NO VIOLENT CONTACT WITH VICTIM | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | NO ALCOHOL | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
SET FOR FAP - FIRST APPEARANCE 5/9/2022 10:00 AM APPEARANCE, FIRST FAP - FIRST APPEARANCE 5/9/2022 10:00 AM APPEARANCE, FIRST |
|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
CONTINUED TO 06/06/2022 1:00 PM AR - ARRAIGNMENT 6/6/2022 1:00 PM AR - ARRAIGNMENT PARNOFIELLO, JOHN |
|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | VICTIM PRESENT IN COURT VICTIM PRESENT IN COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.