Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cindy Whitfield, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Morton Fishman, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with John J. Parnofiello presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn J. Parnofiello Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 23, 2022 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
DISM/SETTLE/DISP AFTER HRG DADR - DISMISSED/SETTLED DISPOSED AFTER HEARING |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE F/B PET |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MEMO OF DISPOSITION F/B COC |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL PETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST CYBER STALKING/STALKING VIOLENCE DTD 06/06/2022 JUDGE PARNOFIELLO COPY GIVEN TO RESPONDENT IN OPEN COURT |
|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED) SERVED ON MORTON FISHMAN ON 5/24/22 |
|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
CIVIL DATE OF BIRTH DATE OF BIRTH FORM |
|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR INJUNCTION STALKING F/B PET | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING MONDAY JUNE 6 2022 2:00 PM 2C DTD 5/23/22 JUDGE PARNOFIELLO ***PBSO TO SERVE DE # 4, 5,9*** | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL COMMENTS | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.