Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Penny Glaser Goldberg, filed a(n) 3 case against Leonid Kaplan, Tony Agulansky, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with Samantha Schosberg Feuer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 15, 2022 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
|
This complaint document appears to be related to a burglary and theft incident. The document includes information about the case number, offense report, and details about the incident. It mentions that the offense occurred between February 1, 2019, a...
COMPLAINT
Date: November 18, 2022PAID $1.80 ON RECEIPT 4684676
Date: November 18, 2022APPL AND AFF OF INDIGENCY
Date: November 15, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: November 15, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: November 15, 2022ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE
Date: March 02, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 09, 2022ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34241 PAGE 1651-1651
Date: April 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34241 PAGE 1651-1651 S FEUER DTD 4/11/2023 THIS CASE IS DISMISSED W/O PREJUDICE. CLERK SHALL CLOSE THE FILE. |
|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER DBO - DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER |
|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO EFFECT SERVICE UPON DEFENDANT(S) ODS SAMANTHA SCHOSBERG FEUER 03/02/2023 |
|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO LEONID KAPLAN SENT VIA EMAIL |
|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT F/B PLT |
|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
PAID $1.80 ON RECEIPT 4684676 $1.80 4684676 Fully Paid |
|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
DIVISION ASSIGNMENT AH: Circuit Civil Central - AH (Civil) |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
APPL AND AFF OF INDIGENCY PLT FOUND INDIGENT |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED ISSUED TO TONY AGULANSKY ** OTC |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.