Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sandra Goodwin, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Shana Nogues, against Southeastern Grocers Inc, Winn Dixie Stores Inc, represented by Molly O'Donnell, Rachel Studley, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with Richard L. Oftedal presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 23, 2022 |
CategoryPremises Liability Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 23, 2022PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4514342
Date: June 26, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: June 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT |
|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER OFTEDAL DTD 9/8/23: DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE APPLICABLE DISMISSAL PAPERS W/IN 30 DAYS OFTEDAL DTD 9/8/23: DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE APPLICABLE DISMISSAL PAPERS W/IN 30 DAYS |
|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE CIVIL PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE AND RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT, WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT, WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER R OFTEDAL DTD. 8/14/23 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS ANSWER AND DEFENSES IS GRANTED R OFTEDAL DTD. 8/14/23 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS ANSWER AND DEFENSES IS GRANTED |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED COPY C BELL DTD 7/20/23 THAT SAID MOTION IS GRANTED. CASE #2023CA007932XXXMB AF SHALL BE CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE NO. 2022CA006070XXXXMB AK THE CLERK IS TO TRANSFER THIS MATTER TO DIVISION AK. |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING ORDER SPECIALLY SETTING REMOTE HEARING SEPTEMBER 11, 2023 10:15 AM ZOOM RICHARD L. OFTEDAL SENIOR 7/17/2023 |
|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE NOTICE OF FORWARDING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT NOTICE OF FORWARDING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.