Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Genevieve Lemley filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Leviticus Clarence Edwards, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with John J. Parnofiello presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn J. Parnofiello Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
ORDER FINDING PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: December 20, 2021ORDER OF NO CONTACT
Date: December 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CROSS REFERENCE LIST | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FINDING PROBABLE CAUSE | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | ARREST RECORD | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
DIVISION ASSIGNMENT DVTD: Dom Battery & DVRV Inj Hearings - DVTD (County) |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
SET FOR FAP - FIRST APPEARANCE 12/20/2021 10:00 AM APPEARANCE, FIRST FAP - FIRST APPEARANCE 12/20/2021 10:00 AM APPEARANCE, FIRST |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
784.03(1A1) SIMPLE BATTERY (DOMESTIC) 784.03(1A1) |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF NO CONTACT | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | APD APPOINTED PER COURT APD | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM ORDER FILED | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
CONTINUED TO 01/20/2022 1:00 PM AR - ARRAIGNMENT 1/20/2022 1:00 PM AR - ARRAIGNMENT SURBER, MELANIE D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.