Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Henry B Peterson, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with CHARLES E BURTON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2023 | Docket Event | PAID $26.00 ON RECEIPT 4196665 | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | REPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY: DEVITT, FRED B | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED BY JUDGE DJ - DISPOSED BY JUDGE |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISCHARGE BOOK 33973 PAGE 63-63 OF HENRY B PETERSON JR; JDG CHARLES E BURTON - DTD 11/15/2022 |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Petitioner: PETERSON, HENRY B JR | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
PAID $3.00 ON RECEIPT 4614407 $3.00 4614407 Fully Paid |
|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
WAIVER - FULL ESTATE WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND SERVICE OF PETTI ION FOR DISCHARGE; RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE (FULL WAIVER |
|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
WAIVER - FULL ESTATE WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE (FULL WAIVER |
|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | REPORT OF DISTRIBUTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.