Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Christy A Goulbourne, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with Jon J. Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 17, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | REPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY: ORREGO, FERNANDO | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED BY JUDGE DJ - DISPOSED BY JUDGE |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION BOOK 34073 PAGE 16-16 SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHNSON ON JAN 12, 2023 |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Petitioner: GOULBOURNE, CHRISTY A | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER ADMITTING WILL SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHNSON ON JAN 12, 2023 |
|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF WILL | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON PETITION TO REOPEN AND FURTHER ADMIN SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHNSON ON DEC 21, 2022 ON PETITION TO REOPEN AND FURTHER ADMIN SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHNSON ON DEC 21, 2022 |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION OF COUNSEL SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHNSON ON DEC 21, 2022 ON JOINT STIPULATION OF COUNSEL SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHNSON ON DEC 21, 2022 |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
WAIVER AND CONSENT JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.