Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lawrence Bernstone, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with CHARLES E BURTON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING THE TRANSFER OF PNC BANK ACCOUNT AND CHARLES SCHWAB BROKERAGE ACCOUNT TO LAWRENCE BERNSTONE; JDG CHARLES E BURTON - DTD 11/15/2022 APPROVING THE TRANSFER OF PNC BANK ACCOUNT AND CHARLES SCHWAB BROKERAGE ACCOUNT TO LAWRENCE BERNSTONE; JDG CHARLES E BURTON - DTD 11/15/2022 |
|
November 13, 2022 | Docket Event | REPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY: ROSE, DANIEL J | |
November 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED BY JUDGE DJ - DISPOSED BY JUDGE |
|
November 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Petitioner: BERNSTONE, LAWRENCE | |
November 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISCHARGE BOOK 33960 PAGE 620-620 SIGNED BY JUDGE BURTON ON NOV 13, 2022 |
|
November 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROBATE CHECKLIST F/B ATTY |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR DISCHARGE F/B LAWRENCE BERNSTONE |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
INVENTORY - ESTATE F/B LARENCE BERNSTONE |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
REPORT OF DISTRIBUTION F/B LAWRENCE BERNSTONE |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
PETITION TO TRANSFER PNC BANK ACCOUNT AND CHARLES SCHWAB BROKERAGE ACCOUNT TO LAWRENCE BERNSTONE F/B LAWRENCE BERSTONE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.